LA HB529 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-17 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 23, nays 67. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires instruction with respect to sex education in public schools (EG SEE FISC NOTE EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires instruction with respect to sex education in public schools (EG SEE FISC NOTE EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House Vote on HB 529, FINAL PASSAGE (#870) (Y: 23 N: 67 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-17 Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 23, nays 67. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
2010-05-17 Called from the calendar.
2010-05-10 Scheduled for floor debate on May 17, 2010.
2010-05-10 Notice given.
2010-05-10 Read by title, returned to the calendar.
2010-05-07 Scheduled for floor debate on May 10, 2010.
2010-05-03 Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2010-04-29 Reported favorably (10-6) (Regular).
2010-03-29 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2010-03-19 First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
2010-03-15 Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2010-03-15 Prefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback