LA HB525 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-07 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
Pending: Senate Judiciary C Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-07 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
Pending: Senate Judiciary C Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the crime of operating a vehicle while intoxicated
Title
Provides relative to the crime of operating a vehicle while intoxicated
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 525 FINAL PASSAGE (#684) (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-05-02 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 11. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-02 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-02 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-02 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-02 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported with amendments (6-5). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |