LA HB525 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - Becomes HB No. 1194.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires public high school students to perform community service as a prerequisite for graduation (OR SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires public high school students to perform community service as a prerequisite for graduation (OR SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-12 Becomes HB No. 1194.
2012-04-11 Reported by substitute (13-0) (Regular)
2012-03-12 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2012-03-03 First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012.
2012-02-29 Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2012-02-29 Prefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback