LA HB525 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-08 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the election districts for congress

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the election districts for congress

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-08 Involuntarily deferred in committee.
2011-04-25 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2011-04-18 First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011.
2011-04-15 Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2011-04-15 Prefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback