LA HB525 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Effective date: June 21, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Effective date: June 21, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DPS&C and the Board of Parole to participate in the offset program established within the Dept. of Revenue to collect past due probation or parole fees
Title
Requires DPS&C and the Board of Parole to participate in the offset program established within the Dept. of Revenue to collect past due probation or parole fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 525, FINAL PASSAGE (#1320) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 525, FINAL PASSAGE (#479) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 525, FINAL PASSAGE (#479) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Effective date: June 21, 2010. | |
2010-06-21 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 381. | |
2010-06-14 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-11 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-11 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-10 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-10 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-04 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-03 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-02 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2010-05-03 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. | |
2010-04-29 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-04-28 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-22 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 28, 2010. | |
2010-04-22 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-21 | Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-15 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-03-15 | Prefiled. |