LA HB524 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Becomes HB 699.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for decriminalization of marijuana and regulation of marijuana for recreational use (OR SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for decriminalization of marijuana and regulation of marijuana for recreational use (OR SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28HouseBecomes HB 699.
2021-04-27HouseReported by substitute (7-5).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2021-04-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback