LA HB524 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Effective date: 01/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requires policies prohibiting sexual harassment and annual training on preventing sexual harassment (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires policies prohibiting sexual harassment and annual training on preventing sexual harassment (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors

Rep. Barbara Carpenter [D]Rep. Mark Abraham [R]Rep. Neil Abramson [D]Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]
Rep. John Anders [D]Rep. James Armes [D]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]
Rep. John Bagneris [D]Rep. Taylor Barras [R]Rep. John Berthelot [R]Rep. Robert Billiot [D]
Rep. Stuart Bishop [R]Rep. Joseph Bouie [D]Rep. Ken Brass [D]Rep. Chad Brown [D]
Rep. Terry Brown [I]Rep. Thomas Carmody [R]Rep. Gary Carter [D]Rep. Robert Carter [D]
Rep. Stephen Carter [R]Rep. Charles Chaney [R]Rep. Patrick Connick [R]Rep. Jean-paul Coussan [R]
Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. Raymond Crews [R]Rep. Paula Davis [R]Rep. Phillip DeVillier [R]
Rep. Royce Duplessis [D]Rep. Stephen Dwight [R]Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]Rep. Julie Emerson [R]
Rep. Franklin Foil [R]Rep. A.B. Franklin [D]Rep. Randal Gaines [D]Rep. Raymond Garofalo [R]
Rep. Jerry Gisclair [D]Rep. Cedric Glover [D]Rep. John Guinn [R]Rep. Jeff Hall [D]
Rep. Jimmy Harris [D]Rep. Lance Harris [R]Rep. Kenneth Havard [R]Rep. Lowell Hazel [R]
Rep. Cameron Henry [R]Rep. Bob Hensgens [R]Rep. Stephanie Hilferty [R]Rep. Dorothy Hill [D]
Rep. Valarie Hodges [R]Rep. Frank Hoffmann [R]Rep. Paul Hollis [R]Rep. Dodie Horton [R]
Rep. Frank Howard [R]Rep. Marcus Hunter [D]Rep. Mike Huval [R]Rep. Barry Ivey [R]
Rep. Katrina Jackson [D]Rep. Edward James [D]Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]
Rep. Robert Johnson [D]Rep. Sam Jones [D]Rep. Edmond Jordan [D]Rep. Nancy Landry [R]
Rep. Terry Landry [D]Rep. Bernard LeBas [D]Rep. Christopher Leopold [R]Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]
Rep. Tanner Magee [R]Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]Rep. Joseph Marino [I]Rep. Jack McFarland [R]
Rep. Blake Miguez [R]Rep. Dustin Miller [D]Rep. Gregory Miller [R]Rep. Helena Moreno [D]
Rep. James Morris [R]Rep. Nicholas Muscarello [R]Rep. Barbara Norton [D]Rep. Kevin Pearson [R]
Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]Rep. Rogers Pope [R]Rep. Stephen Pugh [R]Rep. Steve Pylant [R]
Rep. Eugene Reynolds [D]Rep. Jerome Richard [I]Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]Rep. Alan Seabaugh [R]
Rep. Scott Simon [R]Rep. Patricia Smith [D]Rep. Joseph Stagni [D]Rep. John Stefanski [R]
Rep. Julie Stokes [R]Rep. Kirk Talbot [R]Rep. Major Thibaut [D]Rep. Polly Thomas [R]
Rep. Malinda White [D]Rep. Mark Wright [R]Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]Sen. John Alario [R]
Sen. R Allain [R]Sen. Conrad Appel [R]Sen. Regina Barrow [D]Sen. Wesley Bishop [D]
Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D]Sen. Troy Carter [D]Sen. Norby Chabert [R]Sen. Dan Claitor [R]
Sen. Patrick Cortez [R]Sen. Jack Donahue [R]Sen. Dale Erdey [R]Sen. James Fannin [R]
Sen. Ryan Gatti [R]Sen. Sharon Hewitt [R]Sen. Ronnie Johns [R]Sen. Eric LaFleur [D]
Sen. Eddie Lambert [R]Sen. Gerald Long [R]Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D]Sen. Daniel Martiny [R]
Sen. John Milkovich [D]Sen. Fred Mills [R]Sen. Beth Mizell [R]Sen. Jean-Paul Morrell [D]
Sen. Dan Morrish [R]Sen. Barrow Peacock [R]Sen. Jonathan Perry [R]Sen. Karen Peterson [D]
Sen. Edward Price [D]Sen. Neil Riser [R]Sen. Gary Smith [D]Sen. John Smith [R]
Sen. Gregory Tarver [D]Sen. Francis Thompson [D]Sen. Michael Walsworth [R]Sen. Rick Ward [D]
Sen. Mack White [R]

Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 524 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#854) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 524 FINAL PASSAGE (#687) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 524 CO-AUTHORS (#686) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Vote on HB 524 FINAL PASSAGE (#74) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HouseEffective date: 01/01/2019.
2018-05-17HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 270.
2018-05-11HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-10HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-09HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2018-05-03HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/09/18.
2018-05-02HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2018-05-01SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-04-23SenateReported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-04-19SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-18SenateReported with amendments.
2018-04-10SenateRules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2018-04-09SenateReported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-04-05SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-04SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2018-03-26SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2018-03-22SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-03-21HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-03-15HouseScheduled for floor debate on 03/21/18.
2018-03-15HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-03-14HouseReported with amendments (6-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-03-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-03-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB524&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1072481
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075188
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077843
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095028
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099819
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075122
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1074854
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075866
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077765
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082927
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083689
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087845
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088727
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088886
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092229
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089744
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089540
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093281
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093558
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094910
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1072505
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075244
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077954
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083251
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084048
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088124
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095616
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077782
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092273
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092283

Bill Comments

feedback