LA HB524 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the crime of domestic abuse battery
Title
Amends the crime of domestic abuse battery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 524, FINAL PASSAGE (#1344) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 524, FINAL PASSAGE (#813) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 524, FINAL PASSAGE (#813) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-06-21 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 380. | |
2010-06-14 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-11 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-11 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-10 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-10 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-04 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-03 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-02 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2010-05-18 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. | |
2010-05-17 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-05-13 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-05-07 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 13, 2010. | |
2010-05-07 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |
2010-05-06 | Reported favorably (10-0) (Local and Consent). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-15 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-03-15 | Prefiled. |