LA HB519 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-29 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-29 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to judgeships of the Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
Title
Provides relative to judgeships of the Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-29 | House | Notice removed |
2019-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19. |
2019-05-28 | House | Notice given. |
2019-05-28 | House | Notice removed |
2019-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/19. |
2019-05-22 | House | Notice given. |
2019-05-22 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19. |
2019-05-20 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2019-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2019-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |