LA HB518 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Becomes Act No. 472.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Becomes Act No. 472.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for matters which may be considered in a regular session convening in an odd-numbered year (REC NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for matters which may be considered in a regular session convening in an odd-numbered year (REC NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 518 ADOPT (#1050) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Vote on HB 518 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1031) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 518 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#682) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 518 FINAL PASSAGE (#538) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 518 FINAL PASSAGE (#329) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Vote on HB 518 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1031) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 518 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#682) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 518 FINAL PASSAGE (#538) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 518 FINAL PASSAGE (#329) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Becomes Act No. 472. |
2015-06-15 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-11 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-10 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2015-06-10 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2015-06-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/10/2015. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2015-06-08 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2015-06-07 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Amedee, Morrell, and Alario. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2015-06-03 | House | House conferees appointed: Stokes, Tim Burns, and Ivey. |
2015-06-02 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2015-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/02/2015. |
2015-05-26 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-13 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/13/2015. |
2015-05-06 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0-1). |
2015-04-27 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2015-04-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2015-04-03 | House | Prefiled. |