LA HB510 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Read by title. The Senate failed to approve consideration after the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 25 yeas and 8 nays.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the availability of certain criminal justice system data to certain nonprofit entities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the availability of certain criminal justice system data to certain nonprofit entities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 510 2/3 vote (#725) (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 510 PASS TO THIRD READING (#739) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 510 HB 510 BY JAMES (#79) (Y: 63 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-01SenateRead by title. The Senate failed to approve consideration after the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 25 yeas and 8 nays.
2020-06-01SenateNotice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day.
2020-05-31HouseBy a vote of 95 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
2020-05-29SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-29SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-18SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2020-05-15HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 63, nays 30. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
2020-05-13HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-07HouseReported with amendments (10-0).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2020-02-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2020-02-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB510&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1163221
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169879
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173299
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1165934
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169778
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171047
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1163258
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169897
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173324
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172892
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178506
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178981

Bill Comments

feedback