LA HB51 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-27 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on October 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-27 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for prohibition of using private funds for any part of our election system (Item #5)
Title
Provides for prohibition of using private funds for any part of our election system (Item #5)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-23 - House - House Vote on HB 51 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#263) (Y: 66 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 51 FINAL PASSAGE (#216) (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 51 AMENDMENT # 902 BY WARD HB 51 BY MIGUEZ (#215) (Y: 18 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 51 AMENDMENT # 897 BY PEACOCK HB 51 BY MIGUEZ (#214) (Y: 19 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 51 AMENDMENT # 890 BY WARD HB 51 BY MIGUEZ (#213) (Y: 19 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - House - House Vote on HB 51 FINAL PASSAGE (#101) (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 51 FINAL PASSAGE (#216) (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 51 AMENDMENT # 902 BY WARD HB 51 BY MIGUEZ (#215) (Y: 18 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 51 AMENDMENT # 897 BY PEACOCK HB 51 BY MIGUEZ (#214) (Y: 19 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 51 AMENDMENT # 890 BY WARD HB 51 BY MIGUEZ (#213) (Y: 19 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - House - House Vote on HB 51 FINAL PASSAGE (#101) (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2020-10-23 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2020-10-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-10-23 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-10-23 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 66, nays 28, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2020-10-22 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 10/23/20. |
2020-10-22 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 25 yeas and 12 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-10-13 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 28. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-10-12 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/13/20. |
2020-10-12 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-10-07 | House | Reported with amendments (7-5). |
2020-09-29 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |