LA HB506 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-25 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-25 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the amount of the net operating loss deduction (RE -$20,300,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Increases the amount of the net operating loss deduction (RE -$20,300,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Beau Beaullieu [R] | Rep. Dewith Carrier [R] | Sen. Rick Edmonds [R] | Rep. Lance Harris [R] |
Rep. Danny McCormick [R] | Rep. Troy Romero [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 506 FINAL PASSAGE (#610) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-20 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-20 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-05-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2021. |
2021-05-18 | House | Notice given. |
2021-05-18 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2021. |
2021-05-12 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-04-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-04-02 | House | Prefiled. |