LA HB5 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 43-17-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-10-05 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes an income or corporation franchise tax credit for certain broadband coverage providers (Items #39 & 65) (RE -$50,000,000 GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes an income or corporation franchise tax credit for certain broadband coverage providers (Items #39 & 65) (RE -$50,000,000 GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-02 - House - House Vote on HB 5 FINAL PASSAGE (#13) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-05SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2020-10-02HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-09-30HouseScheduled for floor debate on 10/02/20.
2020-09-30HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-09-29HouseReported favorably (14-0).
2020-09-28HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2020-09-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2020-09-25HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=202ES&b=HB5&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1188790
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189507
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190541
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189829
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1188794
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189414
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189705
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189668
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190550
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191710
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190460

Bill Comments

feedback