LA HB498 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination by government agencies and officials on the basis of vaccination or immunity status
Title
Prohibits discrimination by government agencies and officials on the basis of vaccination or immunity status
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 498 ADOPT (#1107) (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Vote on HB 498 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1223) (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 498 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1123) (Y: 66 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 498 FINAL PASSAGE (#901) (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 498 FINAL PASSAGE (#601) (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Vote on HB 498 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1223) (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 498 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1123) (Y: 66 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 498 FINAL PASSAGE (#901) (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 498 FINAL PASSAGE (#601) (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-21 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-07-20 | House | Veto message read. Lies over under the rules. |
2021-07-01 | House | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2021-06-11 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/11/2021. |
2021-06-10 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-10 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 25 yeas and 10 nays. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2021-06-10 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 71, nays 28. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2021-06-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/10/2021. |
2021-06-09 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2021-06-09 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Cathey, Peterson, and Peacock. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2021-06-08 | House | House conferees appointed: Edmonston, Gregory Miller, and Magee. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2021-06-08 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 66, nays 33, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2021-06-07 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2021. |
2021-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 10 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-20 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 30. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2021. |
2021-05-18 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-17 | House | Reported with amendments (8-3-1). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-04-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2021-04-02 | House | Prefiled. |