LA HB498 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requires school crisis management and response plans to provide for parental notification in the event of a shooting or other violent incident or emergency situation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires school crisis management and response plans to provide for parental notification in the event of a shooting or other violent incident or emergency situation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 498 FINAL PASSAGE (#767) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House Vote on HB 498 FINAL PASSAGE (#404) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseEffective date: 08/01/2018.
2018-05-15HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 168.
2018-05-10HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-09HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-08HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2018-05-07SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-02SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-01SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-30SenateReported favorably.
2018-04-17SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-04-16SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-12HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 103, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-06HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/12/18.
2018-04-06HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-05HouseReported favorably (9-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-03-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-03-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback