LA HB498 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for transparency in health services pricing and healthcare quality measures

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for transparency in health services pricing and healthcare quality measures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 498 FINAL PASSAGE (#700) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 498 FINAL PASSAGE (#360) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-29HouseEffective date: August 1, 2015.
2015-06-29HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 338.
2015-06-09HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2015-06-08SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2015-06-07HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2015-06-04HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2015-06-03SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2015-06-01SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2015-05-28SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2015-05-27SenateReported favorably.
2015-05-19SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2015-05-18SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2015-05-14HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2015-05-07HouseScheduled for floor debate on 5/14/2015.
2015-05-07HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2015-05-06HouseReported favorably (11-0).
2015-04-13HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2015-04-03HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2015-04-03HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback