LA HB497 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Becomes HB 702.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Becomes HB 702.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a referendum election in St. Tammany Parish regarding riverboat gaming (OR SEE FISC NOTE RV See Note)
Title
Provides for a referendum election in St. Tammany Parish regarding riverboat gaming (OR SEE FISC NOTE RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Mary DuBuisson [R] | Rep. Larry Frieman [R] | Rep. Paul Hollis [R] | Sen. Robert Owen [R] |
Rep. Mark Wright [R] | Sen. Patrick McMath [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | House | Becomes HB 702. |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported by substitute (8-2-1). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-04-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2021-04-02 | House | Prefiled. |