LA HB496 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-24 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-24 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to special license plates for firefighters with twenty years of service (RE SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)
Title
Provides with respect to special license plates for firefighters with twenty years of service (RE SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 496 FINAL PASSAGE (#399) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-22 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2017-05-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/17. |
2017-05-17 | House | Notice given. |
2017-05-17 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/17. |
2017-05-10 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-10 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2017-05-09 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2017-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2017-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |