LA HB496 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-02 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-02 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the practice of acupuncture
Title
Provides for the practice of acupuncture
Sponsors
Sen. John Morris [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - House - House Vote on HB 496 FINAL PASSAGE (#505) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-04-27 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-04-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2016. |
2016-04-21 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-20 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2016-03-03 | House | Prefiled. |