LA HB495 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the ownership of monetary compensation from the sequestration of carbon

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the ownership of monetary compensation from the sequestration of carbon

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House Vote on HB 495, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1105) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 495, FINAL PASSAGE (#772) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 495, FINAL PASSAGE (#219) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-09 Effective date: August 15, 2010.
2010-06-09 Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 193.
2010-06-04 Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
2010-06-04 Signed by the President of the Senate.
2010-06-03 Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2010-06-02 Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2010-05-27 Scheduled for floor debate on 6/2/2010.
2010-05-25 Received from the Senate with amendments.
2010-05-24 Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2010-05-19 Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2010-05-18 Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2010-05-17 Reported favorably.
2010-04-20 Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
2010-04-19 Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2010-04-15 Scheduled for floor debate on April 19, 2010.
2010-04-13 Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2010-04-12 Reported with amendments (13-0) (Regular).
2010-03-29 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2010-03-19 First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
2010-03-15 Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2010-03-15 Prefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback