LA HB494 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to brewery operations (EG +$79,000 GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to brewery operations (EG +$79,000 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Troy Romero [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-18 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2022. |
2022-05-16 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-12 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2022. |
2022-05-10 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-09 | House | Reported favorably (16-0). |
2022-05-02 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-04-28 | House | Reported favorably (11-0-1). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2022-03-03 | House | Prefiled. |