LA HB494 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date: 06/11/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the determination of where sales and use taxes are due on purchases of certain raw materials converted into asphaltic concrete (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the determination of where sales and use taxes are due on purchases of certain raw materials converted into asphaltic concrete (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 494 FINAL PASSAGE (#722) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Vote on HB 494 FINAL PASSAGE (#128) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17HouseEffective date: 06/11/2019.
2019-06-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 359.
2019-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-03HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-02HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-06-01SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-22SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-21SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-20SenateReported favorably.
2019-05-06SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2019-05-02SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-01HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-01HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-04-24HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/01/19.
2019-04-24HouseNotice given.
2019-04-24HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-04-17HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/24/19.
2019-04-17HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-16HouseReported with amendments (17-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB494&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122092
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125125
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141116
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144280
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124256
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124952
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122109
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124247
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125195
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126714
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143379
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1147371
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130019
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140741

Bill Comments

feedback