LA HB485 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the collection of certain criminal fines, fees, and costs (RE DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the collection of certain criminal fines, fees, and costs (RE DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - House Vote on HB 485 FINAL PASSAGE (#237) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-11 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-11 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-04-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/11/2022. |
2022-04-07 | House | Notice given. |
2022-04-07 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-04-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/07/2022. |
2022-04-04 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported with amendments (17-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2022-03-03 | House | Prefiled. |