LA HB485 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Notice removed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the levy of an excise tax on cannabis (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the levy of an excise tax on cannabis (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28HouseNotice removed
2019-05-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19.
2019-05-23HouseNotice given.
2019-05-23HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-21HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19.
2019-05-21HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-21HouseDischarged from the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-05-07HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-05-06HouseReported favorably (10-0-1).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback