LA HB483 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-25 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-25 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Increases the motor vehicle license tax on private automobiles and establishes the Transportation and Infrastructure Growth of Economy through Roads (TIGER) Fund (OR +$15,730,670 SD RV See Note)
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Increases the motor vehicle license tax on private automobiles and establishes the Transportation and Infrastructure Growth of Economy through Roads (TIGER) Fund (OR +$15,730,670 SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-15 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2011-04-15 | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=11RS&billid=HB483 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=741775 |