LA HB481 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to specialty prestige license plates
Title
Provides relative to specialty prestige license plates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 481 FINAL PASSAGE (#404) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Vote on HB 481 FINAL PASSAGE (#32) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Vote on HB 481 FINAL PASSAGE (#32) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2019. |
2019-05-24 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 18. |
2019-05-23 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-21 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-20 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-04-23 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/19. |
2019-04-16 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2019-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2019-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |