LA HB48 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the requirements for concealed handgun permit safety and training course applicants and instructors

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the requirements for concealed handgun permit safety and training course applicants and instructors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 48 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1087) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 48 FINAL PASSAGE (#877) (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 48 FINAL PASSAGE (#203) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-29HouseEffective date: 08/01/2021.
2021-06-29HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 463.
2021-06-10HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-08HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-08HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2021-06-07HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2021.
2021-06-07HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2021-06-07SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 5 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-06-02SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-06-01SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-06SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2021-05-05SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-04HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2021.
2021-04-29HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-28HouseReported favorably (10-0-1).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2021-03-05HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/5/2021.
2021-03-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2021-03-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB48&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1201633
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218776
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233312
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1236374
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230297
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229902
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1201643
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218795
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230547
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232520
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1236918
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220759
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232489
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233243

Bill Comments

feedback