LA HB473 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-10 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-10 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Establishes certain property tax exemptions for capital investment projects (OR DECREASE LF RV See Note)
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Establishes certain property tax exemptions for capital investment projects (OR DECREASE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Ivey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2023-04-03 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. |
2023-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2023-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |