LA HB471 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-23 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Local & Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-23 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Local & Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the secretary for the municipal fire and police civil service board in the city of Shreveport
Title
Provides relative to the secretary for the municipal fire and police civil service board in the city of Shreveport
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 471 FINAL PASSAGE (#477) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-21 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-21 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/19. |
2019-05-15 | House | Notice given. |
2019-05-15 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/19. |
2019-05-06 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2019-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2019-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |