LA HB468 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for insurance coverage of breast reduction procedures (EG INCREASE EX See Note)
Title
Provides for insurance coverage of breast reduction procedures (EG INCREASE EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Green [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-04-12 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2022-03-03 | House | Prefiled. |