LA HB466 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to notice requirements for property that is subject to tax sales (REC SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)
Title
Provides relative to notice requirements for property that is subject to tax sales (REC SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 466 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1039) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 466 ADOPT (#1023) (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 466 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#962) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 466 FINAL PASSAGE (#890) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 466 AMENDMENT # 3305 BY BARROW HB 466 BY DAVIS (#889) (Y: 8 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 466 FINAL PASSAGE (#307) (Y: 63 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 466 ADOPT (#1023) (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 466 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#962) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 466 FINAL PASSAGE (#890) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 466 AMENDMENT # 3305 BY BARROW HB 466 BY DAVIS (#889) (Y: 8 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 466 FINAL PASSAGE (#307) (Y: 63 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2019. |
2019-06-20 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 384. |
2019-06-10 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2019-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 93, nays 1. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2019-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. |
2019-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 3 nays. |
2019-06-06 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2019-06-05 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Carter, and Gary Smith. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2019-06-05 | House | House conferees appointed: Davis, Abramson, and Jimmy Harris. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2019-06-04 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2019-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/04/19. |
2019-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 3 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-14 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 63, nays 22. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-14 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-05-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19. |
2019-05-08 | House | Notice given. |
2019-05-08 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-08 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-05-08 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/19. |
2019-04-30 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |