LA HB462 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Effective date: 08/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requires public school governing authorities to post certain fiscal information on their websites (EN +$232,710 GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires public school governing authorities to post certain fiscal information on their websites (EN +$232,710 GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 462 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1087) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 462 FINAL PASSAGE (#864) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 462 FINAL PASSAGE (#476) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-14HouseEffective date: 08/01/2023.
2023-06-14HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 370.
2023-06-09HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2023-06-08SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2023-06-07HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2023-06-06HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2023-06-05HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/06/2023.
2023-06-05HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2023-06-05SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2023-06-05SenateRules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
2023-06-04SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2023-06-04SenateRules suspended.
2023-05-31SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2023-05-30SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2023-05-29SenateReported with amendments.
2023-05-26SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2023-05-26SenateSenate Committee amendments read and adopted.
2023-05-25SenateReported with amendments.
2023-05-18SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2023-05-17SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2023-05-17HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2023-05-11HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2023.
2023-05-09HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2023-05-08HouseReported favorably (18-0).
2023-04-26HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2023-04-25HouseReported favorably (10-0).
2023-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2023-04-03HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023.
2023-03-31HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2023-03-31HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=23rs&b=HB462&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1309096
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1315642
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1330896
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1332529
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1325878
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1325873
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1325824
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1325831
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1326676
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1326654
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1328564
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1328872
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1309138
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1314520
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1315824
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1315794
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1325950
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1326504
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1326715
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1330305
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1330587
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1331088
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1334441
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1323239
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1330257
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1330694

Bill Comments

feedback