LA HB460 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to direct to consumer laboratory services for patients
Title
Provides relative to direct to consumer laboratory services for patients
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2020-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20. |
2020-05-13 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2020-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2020-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |