LA HB460 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Called from the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Called from the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes an income and corporate franchise tax credit for purchase and installation of surveillance cameras in certain commercial vehicles (EG DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Title
Establishes an income and corporate franchise tax credit for purchase and installation of surveillance cameras in certain commercial vehicles (EG DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Talbot [R] | Rep. Paula Davis [R] | Rep. Dodie Horton [R] | Rep. Mike Huval [R] |
Rep. Jeremy LaCombe [D] | Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-04-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/19. |
2019-04-24 | House | Notice given. |
2019-04-24 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/24/19. |
2019-04-17 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported with amendments (17-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |