LA HB46 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective date: 01/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to certain pretrial procedures

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to certain pretrial procedures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 46 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1150) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 46 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#879) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 46 FINAL PASSAGE (#547) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 46 FINAL PASSAGE (#187) (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14HouseEffective date: 01/01/2022.
2021-06-14HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 252.
2021-06-11HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-09HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-08HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2021-06-08HouseRules suspended.
2021-06-08HouseNotice the Senate discharged the Conference Committee.
2021-06-08SenateSenate Conference Committee members discharged.
2021-06-08SenateNotice the House discharged the Conference Committee.
2021-06-07HouseDischarged from Conference Committee.
2021-06-03HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2021-06-02SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2021-06-02SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Foil, Reese, and Ward.
2021-06-02HouseHouse conferees appointed: James, Bacala, and Villio.
2021-06-01SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2021-06-01HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 3, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2021-05-27HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/01/2021.
2021-05-26HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2021-05-26SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-19SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-20SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-18SenateReported with amendments.
2021-05-06SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2021-05-05SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-04HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-04HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-03HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-03HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2021.
2021-04-27HouseNotice given.
2021-04-27HouseRead by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
2021-04-26HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2021.
2021-04-26HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-22HouseReported with amendments (5-4).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2021-03-05HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/5/2021.
2021-03-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2021-03-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB46&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1201629
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216566
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220716
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233668
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235434
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214992
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216523
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216765
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217839
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220553
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224920
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224919
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1201636
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216724
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220936
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225841
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229217
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1236951
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220666
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228671
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230198
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233572

Bill Comments

feedback