LA HB459 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to fantasy sports contests (EN +$94,000 SG EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to fantasy sports contests (EN +$94,000 SG EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 459 ADOPT (#1044) (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 459 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1059) (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 459 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#961) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 459 FINAL PASSAGE (#886) (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 459 FINAL PASSAGE (#464) (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 459 FINAL PASSAGE (#464) (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18HouseVetoed by the Governor.
2019-06-10HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-06SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-06HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-06SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 25 yeas and 12 nays.
2019-06-06SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2019-06-06HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 70, nays 24. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2019-06-06HouseConference Committee report received.
2019-06-06HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2019-06-05SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Gary Smith, Martiny, and Cortez.
2019-06-05SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2019-06-05HouseHouse conferees appointed: Talbot, Mack, and Muscarello.
2019-06-04SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2019-06-04HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The Senate amendments, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were rejected. Conference committee appointment pending.
2019-06-03HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/04/19.
2019-06-03HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-06-03SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 24 yeas and 13h nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-06-02SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted; read by title and returned to its regular order on third reading and final passage.
2019-06-02SenateRules suspended.
2019-05-30SenateReported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-29SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-28SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2019-05-23SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2019-05-22SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-21HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 27. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/21/19.
2019-05-09HouseRead by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-09HouseDischarged from the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2019-05-08HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2019-05-07HouseReported with amendments (10-1-1). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB459&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121755
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132024
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133077
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136500
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143630
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124288
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131939
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132748
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135555
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135476
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136190
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136438
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136429
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138463
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139397
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139518
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140376
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141695
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141642
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141342
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142244
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142565
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121757
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131705
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132296
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133128
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133281
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136578
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137751
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138804
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143607
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143861
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145053
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145627
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136432
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136596
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141757
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143610
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143617

Bill Comments

feedback