LA HB457 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the designation of a strict speed enforcement zone in the village of Robeline

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the designation of a strict speed enforcement zone in the village of Robeline

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - House Vote on HB 457 FINAL PASSAGE (#31) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-04-24SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-04-23HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-04-17HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/23/19.
2019-04-16HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-15HouseReported with amendments (16-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback