LA HB454 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-31 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 34, nays 57. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-31 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 34, nays 57. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to settlement or payment of a claim under a vehicle liability insurance policy
Title
Provides relative to settlement or payment of a claim under a vehicle liability insurance policy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-31 - House - House Vote on HB 454 FINAL PASSAGE (#158) (Y: 34 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 34, nays 57. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-03-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/31/2014. |
2014-03-20 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2014-02-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2014-02-26 | House | Prefiled. |