LA HB453 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to a program of hospital assessments and intergovernmental transfers for health services financing (EG INCREASE LF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to a program of hospital assessments and intergovernmental transfers for health services financing (EG INCREASE LF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 453 FINAL PASSAGE (#416) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-17SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-05-13SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-12HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-06HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2021.
2021-05-06HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-06HouseDischarged from the Committee on Appropriations.
2021-05-06HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2021-05-05HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-04-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback