LA HB452 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Law

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 452 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#766) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 452 FINAL PASSAGE (#511) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 452 FINAL PASSAGE (#299) (Y: 82 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11HouseEffective date: See Act.
2019-06-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 231.
2019-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-03HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-31HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2019-05-28HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/31/19.
2019-05-28HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-05-27SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-23SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-22SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-21SenateReported favorably.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2019-05-15SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-14HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19.
2019-05-02HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-01HouseReported with amendments (12-0-1).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB452&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121720
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130204
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134129
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140323
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144094
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129292
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130086
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130657
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137323
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138927
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140176
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121745
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130344
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134156
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145490
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134115
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137951

Bill Comments

feedback