LA HB452 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Makes requirement for in-service training relative to suicide prevention applicable to nonpublic and charter school teachers and other employees
Title
Makes requirement for in-service training relative to suicide prevention applicable to nonpublic and charter school teachers and other employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 452 FINAL PASSAGE (#502) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 452 FINAL PASSAGE (#179) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 452 FINAL PASSAGE (#179) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | House | Effective date: 08/01/17. |
2017-06-12 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 86. |
2017-05-31 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-05-25 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-05-25 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-08 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2017-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2017-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |