LA HB450 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for access to an adopted person's original birth certificate
Title
Provides for access to an adopted person's original birth certificate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 450 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1594) (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 450 FINAL PASSAGE (#1299) (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 450 AMENDMENT # 4332 BY LUNEAU HB 450 BY OWEN C. (#1298) (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 450 AMENDMENT # 4333 BY LUNEAU HB 450 BY OWEN C. (#1297) (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-28 - House - House Vote on HB 450 FINAL PASSAGE (#93) (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Vote on HB 450 AMENDMENT # 1720 BY MILLER G. MOTION TO ADOPT (#92) (Y: 23 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 450 FINAL PASSAGE (#1299) (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 450 AMENDMENT # 4332 BY LUNEAU HB 450 BY OWEN C. (#1298) (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 450 AMENDMENT # 4333 BY LUNEAU HB 450 BY OWEN C. (#1297) (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-28 - House - House Vote on HB 450 FINAL PASSAGE (#93) (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Vote on HB 450 AMENDMENT # 1720 BY MILLER G. MOTION TO ADOPT (#92) (Y: 23 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2022. |
2022-06-15 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 470. |
2022-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-05 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 83, nays 15, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022. |
2022-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 5 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-03-28 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 21. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-03-28 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-03-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/28/2022. |
2022-03-24 | House | Notice given. |
2022-03-24 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-03-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/24/2022. |
2022-03-22 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-03-21 | House | Reported favorably (12-0-1). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-03-03 | House | Prefiled. |