LA HB449 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-20 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-20 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the classification of applicable fair market percentages for property subject to ad valorem taxation (EG NO IMPACT LF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for the classification of applicable fair market percentages for property subject to ad valorem taxation (EG NO IMPACT LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Ivey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19. |
2019-05-07 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |