LA HB446 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to notifications of public meetings and duties of public bodies and the commissioner of administration relative thereto (RR INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to notifications of public meetings and duties of public bodies and the commissioner of administration relative thereto (RR INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - House Vote on HB 446 FINAL PASSAGE (#610) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-18 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/18/2024. |
2024-04-16 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported with amendments (18-0). |
2024-04-08 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-02-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-02-29 | House | Prefiled. |