LA HB446 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Effective date: 08/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to online handgun education course curriculum

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to online handgun education course curriculum

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 446 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1085) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 446 FINAL PASSAGE (#823) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 446 FINAL PASSAGE (#607) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-12HouseEffective date: 08/01/2023.
2023-06-12HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 295.
2023-06-09HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2023-06-08SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2023-06-07HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2023-06-06HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2023-06-05HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/06/2023.
2023-06-05HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2023-06-05SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2023-06-02SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2023-06-01SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2023-05-31SenateReported with amendments.
2023-05-25SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2023-05-24SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2023-05-23HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2023-05-18HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2023.
2023-05-18HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2023-05-17HouseReported favorably (8-0-1).
2023-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2023-04-03HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023.
2023-03-31HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2023-03-31HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=23rs&b=HB446&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1309076
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1323266
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1330897
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1332448
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1326901
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1327373
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1309107
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1323409
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1327639
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1330029
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1332954
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1325217
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1329961
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1330690

Bill Comments

feedback