LA HB44 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to district court's and juvenile court's jurisdiction over adults in criminal proceedings

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to district court's and juvenile court's jurisdiction over adults in criminal proceedings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 44 FINAL PASSAGE (#703) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 44 FINAL PASSAGE (#353) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-14HouseEffective date: 08/01/17.
2017-06-14HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 193.
2017-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2017-06-05SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2017-06-04HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2017-06-04HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2017-06-02SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2017-05-31SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2017-05-31SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2017-05-30SenateReported favorably.
2017-05-23SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2017-05-22SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2017-05-18HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2017-05-15HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/18/17.
2017-05-15HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-05-11HouseReported favorably (10-0).
2017-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2017-03-10HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/10/2017.
2017-03-06HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2017-03-06HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=17rs&b=HB44&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1023486
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040857
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1043375
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047813
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1051499
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1043134
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1023490
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1041001
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1043444
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1053342
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1043226
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047706

Bill Comments

feedback