LA HB43 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to contributions to and the administration of the Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System (EG INCREASE APV)
Title
Provides relative to contributions to and the administration of the Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System (EG INCREASE APV)
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Bacala [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - House Vote on HB 43 FINAL PASSAGE (#635) (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-18 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-04-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/18/2024. |
2024-04-17 | House | Notice given. |
2024-04-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-04-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/2024. |
2024-04-10 | House | Notice given. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/10/2024. |
2024-04-09 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-08 | House | Reported with amendments (8-2). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-01-26 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/26/2024. |
2024-01-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-01-26 | House | Prefiled. |