LA HB434 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to definitions, policies, and procedures of Medicaid managed care organizations (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides relative to definitions, policies, and procedures of Medicaid managed care organizations (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Tanner Magee [R] | Sen. Fred Mills [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 434 FINAL PASSAGE (#812) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 434 FINAL PASSAGE (#448) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 434 FINAL PASSAGE (#448) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2019. |
2019-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 319. |
2019-06-05 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-21 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/19. |
2019-05-08 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported with amendments (22-0). |
2019-05-02 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |