LA HB43 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-19 - Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to contributions to and the administration of the Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System (EN SEE ACTUARIAL NOTE APV)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to contributions to and the administration of the Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System (EN SEE ACTUARIAL NOTE APV)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 43 ADOPT (#1418) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 43 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1699) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 43 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1371) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 43 FINAL PASSAGE (#983) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - House Vote on HB 43 FINAL PASSAGE (#635) (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-19HouseEffective date: 07/01/2024.
2024-06-19HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 673.
2024-06-04HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2024-06-02SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2024-06-02HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2024-05-31HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2024-05-31SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
2024-05-31SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2024-05-31HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 101, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2024-05-30HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/31/2024.
2024-05-30SenateConference committee report received.
2024-05-30HouseConference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
2024-05-28HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2024-05-28SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Carter, Price, and Talbot.
2024-05-23SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2024-05-23SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2024-05-23HouseHouse conferees appointed: Bacala, Firment, and Illg.
2024-05-23HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2024-05-23HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2024-05-22HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/23/2024.
2024-05-20HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2024-05-20SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2024-05-15SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2024-05-14SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2024-05-13SenateReported with amendments.
2024-04-23SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2024-04-22SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2024-04-18HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2024-04-18HouseCalled from the calendar.
2024-04-17HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/18/2024.
2024-04-17HouseNotice given.
2024-04-16HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2024-04-16HouseCalled from the calendar.
2024-04-10HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/16/2024.
2024-04-10HouseNotice given.
2024-04-10HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2024-04-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/10/2024.
2024-04-09HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2024-04-08HouseReported with amendments (8-2).
2024-03-11HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2024-01-26HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/26/2024.
2024-01-26HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2024-01-26HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=24rs&b=HB43&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1341431
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1363116
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1367298
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1381317
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1382694
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1362703
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1361795
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1363078
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1364384
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1366076
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1366739
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1373751
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1369693
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1375175
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1341434
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1355277
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1363189
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1363936
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1367425
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1367621
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1373931
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1374853
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1375266
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1378167
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1380389
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1381518
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1386454
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1367253
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1376464
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1378351
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1381002
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1381138

Bill Comments

feedback